GA SB447 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to employment security, so as to change certain provisions relating to unemployment compensation; to change the amount of taxable wages; to change certain provisions relating to determination of the weekly benefit amount; to change certain provisions relating to determination of eligibility for unemployment benefits generally so as to require a waiting period of one week; to provide for related matters; to provide for severability; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Employment Security; unemployment compensation; prov.; change the amount of taxable wages; determination of weekly benefit amount; prov.
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #523 - Passage As Amended (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #522 - Motion To Table (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #521 - Adoption Of Amendment #5 By The Senator From The 41st (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #520 - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By The Senator From The 36th (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #519 - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By The Senator From The 36th (Y: 13 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #518 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 41st (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #522 - Motion To Table (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #521 - Adoption Of Amendment #5 By The Senator From The 41st (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #520 - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By The Senator From The 36th (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #519 - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By The Senator From The 36th (Y: 13 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #518 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 41st (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-28 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-27 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred |