GA SB445 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 407
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to highways, bridges, and ferries, so as to provide for standards for contracts entered into by the Department of Transportation; to provide for a contract bidding process and award procedure; to prohibit camping on portions of the state highway system or property owned by the department; to provide for a definition; to declare property used for camping purposes in violation of such prohibition as contraband; to provide for forfeiture of such property; to provide for applicability; to provide for a penalty; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Transportation; standards for contracts; contract bidding process and award procedure; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #760 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #888 (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 22 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #778 (Y: 149 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #523 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 407
2018-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-19HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-20SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-15SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback