GA SB44 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 20 and 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education and state government, respectively, so as to provide purchasing preferences for Georgia products and sellers; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Government; certain supplies, materials, agricultural products manufactured in this state; provide contractual/purchasing preferences
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Seth Harp [R] | Sen. George Hooks [D] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-25 - House - House Vote #330 - Pass (Y: 157 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - House Vote #329 - Mccall Am To Franklin (Y: 153 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #154 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - House Vote #329 - Mccall Am To Franklin (Y: 153 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #154 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-29 | Act 58 | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-25 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-25 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-27 | Senate Read and Referred |