GA SB435 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 8 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to school buses, so as to revise the enforcement of civil monetary penalties regarding violations of the duties of a driver when meeting or overtaking a school bus; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 14 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to speed detection devices, so as to provide for automated traffic enforcement safety devices in school zones; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
School Buses; civil monetary penalties regarding violations of the duties of a driver; enforcement; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Jennifer Jordan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |