GA SB434 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Board for Physician Workforce, so as to change the name of the Georgia Board for Physician Workforce to the Georgia Board of Health Care Workforce; to provide a definition; to add advanced practice registered nurses to the board's powers, duties, and responsibilities; to expand the board's membership; to amend the the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to conform cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Board for Physician Workforce; Georgia Board of Health Care Workforce; change the name

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #525 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-14SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback