GA SB432 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act for the election and creation of a board of commissioners for Screven County, approved December 9, 1871 (Ga. L. 1871-72, p. 231), as amended, particularly by an Act approved August 19, 1912 (Ga. L. 1912, p. 456), by an Act approved August 16, 1915 (Ga. L. 1915, p. 345), by an Act approved April 3, 1972 (Ga. L. 1972, p. 3495), and by an Act approved March 5, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 3911), so as to provide for the election of members of the Board of Commissioners of Screven County; to revise the districts for the election of members of the board of commissioners; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Commissioners for Screven County; election of members; to revise the districts for the election of members; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Max Burns [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #510 (Y: 153 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #480 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #480 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 395 | |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |