GA SB432 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Insisted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Insisted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income tax, so as to provide for the expiration of certain tax credits; to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the O.C.G.A., relating to exemptions from state sales and use taxes, so as to repeal and reserve certain exemptions from state sales and use taxes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Georgia Tax Credit Business Case Act'
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #783 (Y: 154 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #498 (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #522 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #498 (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #522 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | House Insisted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |