GA SB432 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to possession of dangerous weapons, so as to define a certain term; to provide that a political subdivision shall not enact any ordinance which is more restrictive of the sale or possession of a knife than general law; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and Offenses; define a certain term; political subdivision shall not enact any ordinance more restrictive of sale/possession of knife than general law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #820 - Passage (Y: 124 N: 46 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #589 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #590 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #589 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #590 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 753 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-16 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred |