GA SB426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, so as to streamline the deployment of wireless broadband in the public rights of way; to enact the "Broadband Infrastructure Leads to Development (BILD) Act" to limit the ability of local governing authorities to prohibit, regulate, or charge for use of public rights of way under certain circumstances; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Broadband Infrastructure Leads to Development (BILD) Act"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #807 (Y: 143 N: 10 NV: 23 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #560 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-13SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/SB/426
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/173463.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/174902.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175548.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175543.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175542.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175534.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175533.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175535.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175529.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175575.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/176686.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178772.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178679.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15923
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16255

Bill Comments

feedback