GA SB425 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 417
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to change provisions relating to professional land surveyors; to change and add certain defined terms; to provide for land surveyor interns; to change certain educational and examination requirements; to provide certain exceptions; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Land Surveyors; provisions; change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #785 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #698 (Y: 158 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #546 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07 Act 417
2018-05-07SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-13SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback