GA SB425 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for a new charter for the City of Ringgold, approved May 6, 2009 (Ga. L. 2009, p. 3624), so as to modify compensation and expenses, rules of procedure, a quorum, removal of the city manager, council interference with administration, and selection of the mayor and mayor pro tempore; to modify membership of boards, commissions, and authorities; to modify provisions for vacancies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ringgold, City of; modify compensation and expenses; selection of mayor; memberships of boards, commissions, and authorities
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - House - House Vote #760 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #567 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #567 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 410 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate Hopper |