GA SB420 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding health, so as to require certain health clubs in this state to have at least one functional automated external defibrillator on site at such facility at all times for use during emergencies; to provide for definitions; to provide for requirements for maintaining and using the defibrillator; to provide for inspections; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for penalties; to amend Code Section 51-1-29.3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to immunity for operators of external defibrillators, so as to provide tort immunity for individuals using a defibrillator at a health club; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; health clubs have at least one functional automated external defibrillator on site at such facility; require

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #559 (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-13SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback