GA SB42 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-14-33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to indicators of quality of learning in individual schools and school systems, comparison to state standards, rating schools and school systems, providing information, and uniform definition of "dropout" and "below grade level," so as to provide that the school climate rating does not include discipline data; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; school climate rating does not include discipline data; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #365 (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #328 (Y: 149 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #116 (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2021-05-06 Act 245
2021-05-06SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2021-03-31SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2021-03-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-23HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-05HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-03SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-03SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-03SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-03SenateSenate Tabled
2021-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-01-27SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59066
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/196137
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198233
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199102
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199529
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/200897
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201276
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202119
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199433
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59066#18326
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59066#18336
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59066#18699
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59066#18867

Bill Comments 750

feedback