GA SB415 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend various titles of the O.C.G.A., so as to streamline the process of litigation and reduce costs for Georgia's industries, small businesses, and citizens; to amend Title 9 of the O.C.G.A., relating to civil practice; to amend Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to courts; to amend Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government; to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic; to amend Title 44 of the O.C.G.A., relating to property; to amend Title 51 of the O.C.G.A., relating to torts; to provide for related matters; to provide for severability; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Civil Practice and Litigation; several titles of the O.C.G.A.; amend and revise
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #624 (Y: 18 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #564 (Y: 27 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #564 (Y: 27 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |