GA SB412 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-52.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to composition and election of county boards of education in counties in which there is a homestead option sales and use tax and a county sales and use tax for educational purposes and terms of service, so as to delay the effective date of such Code section until January 1, 2015; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
County Boards of Education; homestead option sales and use tax; county sales and use tax for educational purposes; delay effective date of Code section
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #737 - Passage (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #546 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #546 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 750 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-05 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Read and Referred |