GA SB408 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state government, so as to create a compact among the states to prohibit public financing of professional stadiums; to authorize the Governor to execute such compact; to provide for a purpose; to provide for an effective date for such compact; to provide for an official state representation; to provide for an agreement to prohibit public funding of professional stadiums; to provide for agreements to withhold state moneys from certain public or private entities if such entities publicly fund a professional stadium; to provide for withdrawal from the compact; to provide a short title; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Compact Among the States to Prohibit Public Financing of Professional Stadiums'
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Sen. Vincent Fort [D] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Sen. Michael Williams [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |