GA SB407 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 416
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for comprehensive reform for offenders; to amend Title 15 and Chapter 6A of Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to courts and the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council; to amend Title 17, Code Section 24-4-609, Chapter 5 of Title 40, Title 42, and Code Section 43-1-19 of the O.C.G.A., relating to criminal procedure, impeachment by evidence of conviction of a crime, drivers' licenses, penal institutions, and grounds for refusing to grant or revoking professional licenses; to amend Chapter 2 of Title 31 and Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Department of Community Health and public assistance; to amend Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to crimes and offenses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice System; comprehensive reform for offenders; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #772 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #852 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #782 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #514 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07 Act 416
2018-05-07SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-08SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/SB/407
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/172884.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/174677.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175187.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175189.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177607.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177990.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178186.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178471.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178903.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178712.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15810
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16177
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16300
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16366

Bill Comments

feedback