GA SB406 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 80 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties, municipal corporations, and other governmental entities, so as to provide an additional manner of publishing certain legal notices by counties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Counties, Municipal Corporations, and Other Governmental Entities; additional manner of publishing certain legal notices by counties; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |