GA SB405 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Georgia Student Finance Authority; grants for certain eligible students enrolled in an institution of the University System of Georgia; provide

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Student Finance Authority; grants for certain eligible students enrolled in an institution of the University System of Georgia; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #493 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #494 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-08SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback