GA SB403 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ad valorem taxation of property, so as to revise the language required to be included in the notices of current assessment; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad Valorem Taxation of Property; language required to be included in the notices of current assessment; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] | Sen. Shelly Echols [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Shawn Still [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 403, Sb 180: Senate Vote #581 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66346 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/221901 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66346#23160 |