GA SB403 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-13)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-13)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 37 of the O.C.G.A., relating to mental health, so as to enact the "Georgia Behavioral Health and Peace Officer Co-Responder Act"; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Georgia Behavioral Health and Peace Officer Co-Responder Act"; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #782 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Passage: House Vote #820 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #581 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Passage: House Vote #820 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #581 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-09 | Act 857 | |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |