GA SB402 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 423
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to enact the "Achieving Connectivity Everywhere (ACE) Act"; to amend Titles 32, 36, 48, and 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to highways, bridges, and ferries, local government, revenue and taxation, and state government, respectively, so as to provide for broadband services planning, deployment, and incentives; to provide authorization for the Department of Transportation to take certain actions to enable the rights of way of interstate highways to be used for the deployment of broadband and other communications technologies; to change certain definitions relative to the "OneGeorgia Authority Act" to include broadband services; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Achieving Connectivity Everywhere (ACE) Act"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #881 (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #824 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #754 (Y: 161 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #489 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07 Act 423
2018-05-07SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2018-03-29HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2018-03-23HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 171st, 116th, 172nd
2018-03-23SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 51st, 18th, 56th
2018-03-23HouseHouse Insisted
2018-03-23SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-19HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-07SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback