GA SB401 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 449
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 449
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-327 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to recognition of advanced proficiency/honors courses and counseling and development of individual graduation plans, so as to provide for guidance in career oriented aptitudes and career interests in developing an individual graduation plan; to provide for a review and report of a school counselor's role, workload, program service delivery, and professional learning; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Individual Graduation Plans; guidance in career oriented aptitudes and career interests; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Sen. Horacena Tate [D] | Sen. Donzella James [D] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #754 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #884 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #792 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #530 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #884 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #792 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #530 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Act 449 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |