GA SB40 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to examination, hospitalization, and treatment of involuntary patients, so as to provide for authorization of emergency medical services personnel to transport certain mentally ill patients under certain circumstances; to provide for reporting requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health; transport certain mentally ill patients; authorization of emergency medical services personnel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #45 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-10SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-10SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-23SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback