GA SB4 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to educational programs in elementary and secondary education, so as to enact the "Blind Persons' Braille Literacy Rights and Education Act"; to provide definitions; to require an evaluation of a blind or visually impaired student to determine such student's need for Braille instruction; to require Braille instruction in the individualized education program of a blind or visually impaired student as appropriate; to provide additional requirements for the individualized education program of a blind or visually impaired student; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Blind Persons' Braille Literacy Rights and Education Act"; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #188 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-07HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-06SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-06SenateSenate Third Read
2023-03-06SenateSenate Taken from Table
2023-03-06SenateSenate Tabled
2023-02-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2023-02-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-01-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-01-13SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback