GA SB4 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 26 of the O.C.G.A., relating to drug abuse treatment and education programs, so as to prohibit patient brokering; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for penalties; to provide for enforcement; to provide for venue; to provide for reasonable expenses; to provide for cumulative actions; to amend Chapter 1 of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding insurance, so as to provide that excessive, fraudulent, or high-tech drug testing of certain individuals is considered a fraudulent insurance act; to provide for investigation by the Commissioner of Insurance; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Drug Abuse Treatment and Education Programs; patient brokering; prohibit; definitions; exceptions; penalties; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #258 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #249 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #28 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #249 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #28 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 205 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |