GA SB4 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to establish the Georgia Mental Health Treatment Task Force; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for the membership, duties, compensation, and expense allowances; to develop applications for a Medicaid waiver and block grant funding; to prohibit the submission of a mental health Medicaid waiver application without legislative approval; to require agencies' cooperation; to provide for the abolishment; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Enhancing Mental Health Treatment in Georgia Act"; Georgia Mental Health Treatment Task Force; establish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #300 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #325 (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #25 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-16HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-07SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-02SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-01SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-20SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback