GA SB4 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 61 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to urban redevelopment for counties and municipal corporations, so as to provide for the use of surface transportation projects in urban redevelopment areas; to provide for definitions; to provide for public contracts with private enterprises for the completion of surface transportation projects; to provide for methods of procurement for surface transportation projects in urban redevelopment areas; to provide for limitations on former public employees when negotiating contracts for surface transportation projects; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Urban Redevelopment; provide for use of surface transportation projects; definitions; public contracts with private enterprises for completion
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #425 (Y: 166 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #371 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #332 (Y: 140 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #333 (Y: 130 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #44 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #371 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #332 (Y: 140 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #333 (Y: 130 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #44 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 210 | |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 51st, 24th, 54th |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 51st, 47th, 21st |
2015-03-31 | House | House Insisted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hopper |