GA SB398 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act reconstituting the Board of Education of Talbot County, approved April 5, 1993 (Ga. L. 1993, p. 4710), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 27, 1995 (Ga. L. 1995, p. 3541), so as to provide for compensation of the members of the Board of Education of Talbot County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Education of Talbot County; compensation of the members; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #459 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #459 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 364 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |