GA SB396 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1A of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 46 of the O.C.G.A., relating to telephone system for the physically impaired, so as to change certain provisions relating to the establishment, administration, and operation of the state-wide dual party relay service and audible universal information access service; to change certain legislative findings and declarations; to modify the prohibition as to the distribution of telecommunications equipment under the telecommunications equipment distribution program based on a certain income level; to provide that wireless devices and applications may be distributed as part of the telecommunications equipment distribution program; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telephone System For Physically Impaired; state-wide dual party relay service and audible universal information access service; change provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #549 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-07SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback