GA SB395 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county and municipal hospital authorities, so as to revise the standard of indigency relating to portioning of proceeds from the sale or lease of a hospital by a hospital authority; to provide for additional methods for the investment of funds by hospital authorities which hold an irrevocable trust wherein the corpus exceeds certain amounts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
County and Municipal Hospital Authorities; standard of indigency; proceeds from the sale or lease of a hospital by a hospital authority; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-20 - House - House Vote #678 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #530 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #530 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-16 | Act 471 | |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |