GA SB391 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding insurance, so as to require health insurers to provide coverage for early refills of a 30 day supply of certain prescription medications under certain emergency situations; to amend Code Section 26-4-80 of the O.C.G.A., relating to license required for practice of pharmacy, dispensing of prescription drugs, prescription drug orders, electronically transmitted drug orders, refills, and schedule II controlled substance prescriptions, so as to allow pharmacists to dispense certain refill prescription medications under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Early Prescription Refills During Emergencies Act"; health insurers to provide coverage for early refills of a 30 day supply; require; enact
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #723 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #669 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #556 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #669 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #556 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 589 | |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |