GA SB39 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-6-13 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to penalties for violating Code Sections 16-6-9 through 16-6-12, so as to increase the penalty provisions relating to pimping and pandering; to amend Code Section 42-1-12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Sexual Offender Registry, so as to require registration on the State Sexual Offender Registry when an individual is convicted for the second time for pandering; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pimping and Pandering; increase the penalty provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #536 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-23SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback