GA SB389 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 360
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create and establish the State Court of Houston County, approved February 28, 1975 (Ga. L. 1975, p. 2584), as amended, so as to provide for the location of the state court; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Court of Houston County; location of state court; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - House Vote #684 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #480 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 360
2018-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-09HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-09HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-06SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback