GA SB387 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 359
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to create a new charter for the City of Dahlonega in the County of Lumpkin," approved April 12, 1982 (Ga. L. 1982, p. 4353), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 11, 2010 (Ga. L. 2010, p. 3522), so as to provide for the filling of vacancies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Dahlonega; filling of vacancies; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House Vote #677 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #459 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 359
2018-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-20HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-06SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback