GA SB386 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to sales and use taxes, so as to provide for an exception to the ceiling on local sales and use taxes; to provide for the imposition of a transit special purpose local option sales and use tax within special districts; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to amend Chapter 32 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia Regional Transportation Authority, so as to create the Atlanta-region Transit Link "ATL" Commission to serve as a division within such authority; to provide for purposes of such commission; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Taxes; exception to the ceiling on local sales and use taxes; transit special purpose local option sales and use tax; provide; Atlanta-region Transit Link "ATL" Commission; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #545 (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-05SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback