GA SB384 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Columbia County, approved March 21, 1980 (Ga. L. 1980, p. 3707), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 5, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 3996), so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the continuance in office of current members; to provide effective dates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Commissioners of Columbia County; description of the commissioner districts; change
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Max Burns [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #506 (Y: 144 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #471 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #471 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 368 | |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |