GA SB381 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 448
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to surplus line insurance, so as to provide that a nonadmitted insurer domiciled in this state will be deemed a domestic surplus lines insurer if certain criteria are met; to provide a definition; to provide for criteria; to provide for tax assessment; to provide for certain protection exceptions; to provide for financial and solvency requirements; to provide for exemptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surplus Line Insurance; nonadmitted insurer domiciled in this state will be deemed a domestic surplus lines insurer if certain criteria are met; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #709 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #478 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 448
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-20SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-01SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback