GA SB378 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 28 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fiscal bills generally, so as to require an economic analysis prior to the introduction or amendment of legislation containing tax incentives or modifying or extending existing tax incentives; to provide for definitions; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Georgia Measuring Success Act"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #442 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #446 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-13SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-13SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-13SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-31SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback