GA SB377 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Act 289
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Act 289
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal Article 8 of Chapter 7 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Workforce Development Board, and to amend Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to labor and industrial relations, so as to transfer the State Workforce Development Board from the Department of Economic Development to the Technical College System of Georgia; to revise duties and obligations of the State Workforce Development Board; to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Workforce Development Board; transfer to Technical College System of Georgia; duties and obligations; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #715 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #488 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #488 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Act 289 | |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hopper |