GA SB376 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 356
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 34 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to identity theft, so as to prohibit consumer credit reporting agencies from charging a fee for placing or removing a security freeze on a consumer's account; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identity Theft; consumer credit reporting agencies charging a fee for placing/removing a security freeze; prohibit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #802 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #807 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #511 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 356
2018-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted As Amended
2018-03-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-31SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback