GA SB375 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to children and youth services, so as to allow a child-placing agency to decline to accept a referral from the department and decline to perform services not referred under a contract with the department based on the child-placing agency's sincerely held religious beliefs; to prevent the department from discriminating against or causing any adverse action against a child-placing agency based on its sincerely held religious beliefs; to provide for assertion of such rights; to provide for definitions; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Keep Faith in Adoption and Foster Care Act"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #491 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #492 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-31SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback