GA SB373 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the number of judges of superior courts, so as to provide for an eleventh judge of the superior courts of the Cobb Judicial Circuit; to provide for the appointment of such additional judge by the Governor; to provide for the election of successors to the judge initially appointed; to prescribe the powers of such judge; to prescribe the compensation, salary, and expense allowance of such judge to be paid by the State of Georgia and the county of said circuit; to declare inherent authority; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judges of Superior Courts; eleventh judge of the superior courts of the Cobb Judicial Circuit; appointment of such additional judge; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #497 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-07SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-31SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback