GA SB370 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 355
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to provide that the commissioner of human services waives the first $25,000.00 of any estate; to provide for the submission of an amendment to the state plan; to provide for contingent repeal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Assistance; commissioner of human services waives the first $25,000 of any estate; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #729 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #439 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 355
2018-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-19HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-19HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-13HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-12SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-12SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-08SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-31SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback