GA SB369 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 463
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 17 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenues collected from fines and fees, so as to provide for payments to the Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund from fees collected in criminal and quasi-criminal cases prior to adjudication of guilt; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenues Collected from Fines and Fees; payments to Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund; fees collected in criminal and quasi-criminal cases prior to adjudication of guilt; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #780 (Y: 111 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #455 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 463
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-14SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-31SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback