GA SB369 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 17 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenues collected from fines and fees, so as to provide for payments to the Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund from fees collected in criminal and quasi-criminal cases prior to adjudication of guilt; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Revenues Collected from Fines and Fees; payments to Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund; fees collected in criminal and quasi-criminal cases prior to adjudication of guilt; provide


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #455 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]


2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-14SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-31SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

Bill Comments