GA SB368 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6A of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council, so as to add to the functions and authority of the council; to enable the council to provide technical support and assistance to certain local law enforcement agencies in the attainment of certain grants; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice Coordinating Council; functions and authority; add

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #875 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #454 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-14SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-31SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback