GA SB368 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6A of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council, so as to add to the functions and authority of the council; to enable the council to provide technical support and assistance to certain local law enforcement agencies in the attainment of certain grants; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal Justice Coordinating Council; functions and authority; add
Sponsors
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #875 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #454 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #454 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hopper |