GA SB367 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 45-9-85 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to payment of indemnification for death or disability, procedure for making payments, and appeal, so as to provide for the option of payment to an estate in the case of death suffered in the line of duty by a law enforcement officer, firefighter, emergency medical technician, emergency management specialist, state highway employee, or prison guard; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payment of Indemnification for Death or Disability; option of payment to an estate in the case of death; law enforcement officer; firefighter; emergency medical technician, emergency management specialist, state highway employee or prison guard; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #794 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #453 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-14SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-31SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback