GA SB366 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, so as to require counties and municipal corporations to perform wage and compensation studies for employees of the sheriff's office and law enforcement agencies; to require certain agreement and consultations with sheriffs and chief executives of law enforcement agencies of the county or municipal corporation in conducting such studies; to guide the establishment of pay scales; to require the submission of certain pay scales to the Department of Community Affairs; to provide for rules and regulations; to establish within the Department of Community Affairs a local law enforcement compensation grant program; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government; counties and municipal corporations to perform wage and compensation studies for employees of sheriff's office; require

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #456 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2018-02-14SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-31SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback